Kids in Mind

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide, or assist in the provision of facilities for health recreation, education, leisure, and to provide funds for medical research, in the United Kingdom, for children and youth who by reason of their age, infirmity, disability, poverty or economic circumstances, may have need of such facilities with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 11 April 2013: Standard registration
- 01 July 2013: Funds received from 293156 PHILIP GREEN MEMORIAL TRUST
- Kids in Mind (Working name)
- THE CYRIL PASKIN MEMORIAL TRUST (Previous name)
- THE PASKIN CHILDREN'S TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Mann | Chair | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Finlay J MacLeod | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony David Erwin Metzer | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Howard Mack | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Christopher William Osborne | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Dina Margolin | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Maria Beaver | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
GORDON MOULDS | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £7.50k | £0 | £9.72k | £398.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.56k | £31.48k | £4.21k | £2.87k | £22.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/06/2013 as amended on 08 Dec 2023 as amended on 21 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BY ENABLING AND EMPOWERING EVERYONE EXPERIENCING MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS TO LIVE WITH, MANAGE AND RECOVER FROM THEIR CONDITION. (II) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS IN THE UK AND BRITISH ISLES SUCH FACILITIES TO BE PROVIDED FOR PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR RECREATION OR DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES MAY HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE BENEFICIARIES. (III) TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR MEDICAL RESEARCH AND TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE FOR PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT MAY HAVE NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSON. (IV) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND GENERAL EDUCATION OF YOUTH IN GREATER LONDON AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Berkeley House
Barnet Road
London Colney
Hertfordshire
AL2 1BG
- Phone:
- 01727 742920
- Email:
- info@kidsinmind.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window