Financial history MANOR ROAD PARENT, TEACHER & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1151306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £729 £5.36k £5.20k £8.57k £12.49k
Total expenditure £2.12k £9.33k £1.38k £8.01k £12.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A