FRONTIER THEATRE PRODUCTIONS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Frontier was established to make visible the work of older actors, placing them firmly at the heart of the work. Alongside this is a rolling series of activities, where younger members of the profession can learn from the invaluable experience of their older colleagues. Frontier is where people of all ages meet to create theatre together.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 26 September 2013: Standard registration
- 10 October 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2015 | 29/02/2016 | 28/02/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.70k | £147.96k | £106.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.20k | £115.15k | £121.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2017 | 27 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2017 | 27 November 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 29 February 2016 | 16 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2016 | 16 December 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2015 | 09 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/01/2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:(A)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ART OF THEATRE; AND (B) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONGST PEOPLE OVER THE AGE OF 60 WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR AGE, THROUGH:(I)PROMOTING HIGH QUALITY THEATRICAL PRODUCTIONS INVOLVING ACTORS, ACTRESSES AND OTHER PARTICIPANTS OVER THE AGE OF 60;(II)ENCOURAGING AND COMMISSIONING WRITING FOR THE THEATRE WHICH FOCUSES ON THE LIVES AND CONCERNS OF OLDER PEOPLE;(III)RAISING THE PROFILE AND MORALE OF OLDER PEOPLE WHO WISH TO CARRY ON WORKING IN THE THEATRE AND OF OLDER PEOPLE GENERALLY;(IV)ENCOURAGING OLDER PEOPLE INVOLVED IN THE THEATRE TO PASS ON THEIR SKILLS AND ABILITIES TO YOUNGER PARTICIPANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window