WITHERNSEA AND WARD COMMUNITY GYM AND RECREATION FACILITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WAW gyms provides a weight lifting room, equipped with resistance machines, free weights and cardio machines. fully equipped boxing club. WAW during 2013 -2014 affiliated to the ABAE and provided regular boxing and fitness training on Mondays, Wednesdays and Fridays for under 14?s , women and young ladies and men and young men .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 April 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 May 2013: CIO registration
- 01 July 2020: Removed (Removed by application)
- 01 July 2020: Funds transferred to 1121190 EAST RIDING VOLUNTARY ACTION SERVICES (ERVAS) LIMI...
- WAW GYM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/09/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 29/04/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.08k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.31k | £1.42k | £540 | £0 | £3.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 29 April 2019 | 09 March 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2019 | 09 March 2020 | 9 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 09 March 2020 | 398 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | 09 March 2020 | 398 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 09 March 2020 | 763 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | 09 March 2020 | 763 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 14 May 2013
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SOUTH EAST RIDING OF THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; 2 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY GYM; 3 THE OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND TRAINING IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO HEALTH INCLUDING EXERCISE AND HEALTHY EATING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window