Accounts and annual returns CHRISTIE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151063
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2019 13 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 13 December 2019 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2018 20 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 20 December 2018 On Time