Hull and East Riding Chess Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the game of Chess through the provision of learning, teaching and playing of chess for the benefits of the residents of Hull and District (defined as the local authority areas of Hull and the East Riding).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 19 February 2014: Standard registration
- HULL & DISTRICT CHESS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Malbon | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
David Atkin | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Keith Porteous | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Atkinson | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher John Matthews | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
DOUGLAS VLEESHHOUWER | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR GRAHAM CHESTERS | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Andrew David Bettley | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|||||||||
DEREK ALAN SHEPPARD | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.16k | £5.16k | £13.92k | £20.47k | £17.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.98k | £1.83k | £12.98k | £24.05k | £20.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 12/02/2014 as amended on 27 Feb 2020 as amended on 17 Aug 2021 as amended on 03 May 2022 as amended on 20 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, NAMELY: THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT BY PROMOTING THE GAME OF CHESS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF HULL AND DISTRICT (DEFINED AS THAT AREA BOUNDED ON THE SOUTH BY THE RIVER HUMBER, ON THE EAST BY THE NORTH SEA, AND INLAND BY THE COUNTY OF EAST YORKSHIRE “THE BENEFICIARIES”); THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE LEARNING, TEACHING AND PLAYING OF CHESS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BENEFICIARIES WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 NEWLAND PARK
HULL
HU5 2DN
- Phone:
- 01482444128
- Email:
- GRAHAM.CHESTERS@ICLOUD.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window