UNITED ALLSTARS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
United AllStars provides the opportunity for children and young people in Southwark to take part in football and other sporting activities in order to improve fitness, self-discipline and develop a positive sense of belonging. We run residential trips to the countryside, educational workshops, visits to universities and a range of other activities to improve the life chances of our young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southwark
Governance
- 22 July 2013: Standard registration
- 18 August 2017: Funds received from 1121537 SOUTHWARK CARIBB YOUTH FOOTBALL & SPORTS ACADEMY
- 23 September 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- UNITED ALLSTARS (YOUTH) FC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2014 | 31/05/2015 | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.01k | £22.78k | £38.38k | £58.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.19k | £29.76k | £38.37k | £32.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2017 | 25 June 2018 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2017 | 25 June 2018 | 86 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED ON 29/06/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE AMATEUR SPORT OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL 2. TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING FOOTBALL ACTIVITIES). 3. TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHETHER OR NOT UNDERGOING FORMAL EDUCATION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window