Financial history STOKE-ON-TRENT REPERTORY PLAYERS

Charity number: 503587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £22.29k £873 £30.92k £47.11k £39.01k
Total expenditure £21.35k £6.27k £19.86k £31.47k £31.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A