Financial history AL-GHADEER EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1152267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/03/2020 01/03/2021 01/03/2022 01/03/2023 01/03/2024
Total gross income £5.15k £2.36k £2.68k £2.98k £2.38k
Total expenditure £4.95k £2.45k £2.71k £2.95k £2.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A