Accounts and annual returns THE BIRKETT-SMITH ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1152016
Charity reporting is up to date (203 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 November 2023 23 March 2025 203 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 March 2025 203 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2022 07 March 2025 553 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2022 07 March 2025 553 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2021 15 July 2024 683 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 July 2024 683 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2020 30 November 2022 455 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 November 2022 455 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2019 19 September 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 September 2020 18 days late Download Open in new window