THE BIRKETT-SMITH ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Animal sanctuary
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 14 May 2013: Standard registration
- BSAS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN O BRIEN | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Bellamy | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOY KEYS | Trustee | 08 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2019 | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.37k | £260.54k | £327.88k | £381.66k | £364.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.95k | £249.68k | £309.53k | £379.79k | £420.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 23 March 2025 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 November 2023
(These accounts |
23 March 2025 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 07 March 2025 | 553 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 07 March 2025 | 553 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 15 July 2024 | 683 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 November 2021
(These accounts |
15 July 2024 | 683 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 30 November 2022 | 455 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 November 2020
(These accounts |
30 November 2022 | 455 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2019 | 19 September 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 November 2019
(These accounts |
19 September 2020 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 08/05/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS (IN PARTICULAR SMALL FARM AND DOMESTIC ANIMALS) IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, INFIRMITY, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES AND ILL USAGE BY PROVIDING A FACILITY FOR THEIR CARE AND TREATMENT ON A WHOLLY NON-PROFITABLE BASIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Templemans Ash
Bridport
DT6 5NX
- Phone:
- 07896175830
- Email:
- JOYKEYS@ICLOUD.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window