Financial history COPMANTHORPE YOUTH CLUB

Charity Number: 1151461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.97k £13.78k £9.04k £11.76k £11.56k
Total expenditure £13.39k £5.05k £9.94k £17.27k £14.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.30k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A