VOICE OF THE LISTENER & VIEWER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VLV works to represent UK citizen and consumer interests in broadcasting and speaks for listeners and viewers on the full range of broadcasting issues. We use independent expertise to champion quality and diversity in programming, respond to consultations, write policy briefings, run events and conferences and work for public service broadcasting that informs, educates and entertains.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 May 2013: Standard registration
- 24 September 2013: Funds received from 296207 VOICE OF THE LISTENER TRUST
- VLV (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN BROWNE | Chair | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Hesham Sabry | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Catherine Johnson | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Freda Dixon | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ritula Shah | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jay | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allan Jack | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Charles Usherwood | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Board | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Toni Charlton | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sylvia Margaret Harvey | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stanley Gordon | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mary Dixon | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.46k | £54.95k | £103.01k | £114.62k | £92.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.28k | £59.85k | £95.79k | £115.28k | £107.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED: (A) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL THE FORMS AND ASPECTS OF BROADCASTING, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (I) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT, TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE STUDY, KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF BROADCASTING IN ALL ITS ASPECTS AND PARTICULARLY ITS SUBJECT MATTER, ITS ROLE IN SOCIETY AND ITS TECHNIQUES; (II) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF BROADCASTING AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND (B) FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH MANNER AS IS CHARITABLE BY PROMOTING THE CONTINUANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF HIGH STANDARDS IN BROADCASTING, BOTH TECHNICAL AND ARTISTIC, THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Voice Of The Listener & Viewer
The Old Rectory Business Centre
Springhead Road
Northfleet
Kent
- Phone:
- 01474338716
- Email:
- info@vlv.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window