Financial history AMY'S HOUSE

Charity number: 1151617
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £185.98k £554.46k £400.45k £493.35k £398.49k
Total expenditure £199.41k £515.48k £400.94k £485.39k £434.82k
Income from government contracts £49.94k £276.30k £180.46k £321.82k £358.86k
Income from government grants N/A £165.29k N/A £28.30k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £228.74k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £276.30k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £61 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £49.36k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £515.48k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A