CARING IN BRISTOL

Charity number: 1151645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Caring in Bristol empowers people to move back from homelessness crisis. We work with those at risk of or facing homelessness, public, and partners, to create lasting change. We provide early prevention support, advice, handbooks, and community-based initiatives. Our prevention work, including food-led projects, youth support, a night shelter, and our Christmas project, reach thousands annually.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 April 2013: Standard registration
  • 17 February 2015: Funds received from 900161 CARING AT CHRISTMAS
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CARING AT CHRISTMAS (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Felicity Clark Chair 31 March 2020
None on record
Jerry Milton Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Alex Milliner Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Sophia Gibbs Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Emily Hamilton Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Allan Freeman Trustee 30 March 2022
None on record
Philip Parry Trustee 02 February 2022
None on record
Bejide Kafele Trustee 02 February 2022
None on record
Matthew Neil Morrison Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Joanna Strong Trustee 31 March 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £635.91k £1.59m £996.02k £991.28k £1.37m
Total expenditure £589.90k £1.09m £1.11m £917.22k £1.24m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £112.91k £74.39k £72.63k £208.21k
Income - Donations and legacies £633.93k £1.59m £993.36k £503.32k £1.35m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £481.85k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £1.33k £0 £0 £16.33k
Income - Other £1.98k £548 £2.66k £6.11k £2.40k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £39.96k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £453.86k £825.61k £744.82k £604.23k £877.34k
Expenditure - Raising funds £136.05k £262.13k £364.35k £312.99k £366.17k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.68k £23.88k £18.54k £24.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £0 £9.83k £16.70k £12.87k £66.42k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £383.86k £932.01k £854.22k £989.55k £1.14m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £19.66k £78.01k £120.24k £177.69k £94.78k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Pritchard Street
BRISTOL
BS2 8RH
Phone:
01179244444