Police Care UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE SERVICE IN THE UK BY THE RELIEF OF: (A) BENEFICIARIES IN CASES OF NEED/HARDSHIP/DISTRESS; (B) MENTAL/PHYSICAL SICKNESS/DISABILITY/INFIRMITY AMONG AMONG BENEFICIARIES;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,032,686
Donations and legacies | £800.54k | |
Charitable activities | £472.82k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £724.21k | |
Other | £35.11k |
Total expenditure:
£3,218,681
Raising funds | £362.66k | |
Charitable activities | £2.86m | |
Other | £0 |
£2,175,658 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £362.66k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.86m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £362.66k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.86m | |
Retained for future use | £989.66k |
People

24 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 March 2013: Standard registration
- 26 February 2018: Funds received from 207608 THE NATIONAL POLICE FUND
- THE POLICE DEPENDANTS' TRUST (Previous name)
- THE POLICE DEPENDANTS' TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Belinda Goodwin | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Crane | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan David Threadgold | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liam Jeffrey Kelly | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anil Kanti Basu | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sam Ockham | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Anne Lowes | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Ray Hill | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Tolfrey | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Stephens | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.59m | £1.66m | £1.13m | £1.53m | £1.56m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.79m | £4.85m | £2.81m | £2.72m | £3.22m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £716.61k | £976.69k | £465.12k | £741.26k | £800.54k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £80 | £2.57k | £3.66k | £25.32k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £472.82k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £876.55k | £683.59k | £657.13k | £767.84k | £724.21k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £35.11k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £262.23k | £653.81k | £76.02k | £285.12k | £327.72k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.14m | £4.38m | £2.36m | £2.29m | £2.86m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £649.36k | £476.86k | £445.53k | £429.07k | £362.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £87.61k | £93.56k | £72.41k | £122.32k | £30.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.05m | £2.44m | £165.25k | £116.24k | £32.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £185.42k | £168.53k | £178.27k | £172.24k | £4.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £248.77k | £284.90k | £93.79k | £88.71k | £45.63k | |
|
Long-term investments | £24.35m | £26.34m | £29.06m | £27.60m | £29.78m | |
|
Other assets | £5.60m | £5.36m | £4.03m | £2.79m | £1.43m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £587.30k | £582.25k | £589.39k | £334.94k | £596.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/04/2013 as amended on 19 Apr 2018 as amended on 24 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
4.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE SERVICE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY RELIEVING IN CASES OF NEED: 4.1.1 DEPENDANTS OF POLICE OFFICERS OR SERVING, FORMER OR RETIRED POLICE OFFICERS WHO DIE, OR HAVE DIED AS A RESULT OF AN INJURY RECEIVED, IN THE EXECUTION OF DUTY; AND 4.1.2 POLICE OFFICERS OR SERVING, FORMER OR RETIRED POLICE OFFICERS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN INCAPACITATED AS A RESULT OF AN INJURY RECEIVED IN THE EXECUTION OF DUTY OR DEPENDANTS OF SUCH POLICE OFFICERS. 4.2 "POLICE OFFICER" MEANS ANY POLICE OFFICER FROM ANY POLICE FORCE FROM ANY POLICE AREA IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND INCLUDES: 4.2.1 MEMBERS OF THE BRITISH TRANSPORT POLICE; 4.2.2 MEMBERS OF THE CIVIL NUCLEAR CONSTABULARY; 4.2.3 PERSONS PERFORMING TEMPORARY OVERSEAS OR CENTRAL POLICE SERVICES WHO ENJOY A STATUTORY RIGHT OF REVERSION TO SUCH A POLICE FORCE; 4.2.4 SPECIAL CONSTABLES APPOINTED FOR ANY SUCH POLICE AREA; AND 4.2.5 POLICE CADETS APPOINTED TO UNDERGO TRAINING WITH A VIEW TO BECOMING POLICE OFFICERS OF SUCH POLICE FORCES. 4.3 "DEPENDANTS" MEANS IN RELATION TO A SERVING, FORMER OR RETIRED POLICE OFFICER (WHETHER LIVING OR DECEASED) ANY SPOUSE, FORMER SPOUSE, CIVIL PARTNER, FORMER CIVIL PARTNER, UNMARRIED PARTNER (OF EITHER SEX) CHILD, STEPCHILD, GRANDCHILD AND/OR ANY OTHER MEMBER OF HIS FAMILY WHO IS OR WAS FINANCIALLY RELIANT UPON HIM. 4.4 "INJURY RECEIVED IN THE EXECUTION OF DUTY" HAS THE SAME MEANING (SUBJECT TO NECESSARY ADAPTATIONS IN THE CASE OF SPECIAL CONSTABLES AND POLICE CADETS) AS IN THE PENSION PROVISIONS APPLICABLE TO POLICE OFFICERS AND FOR THE TIME BEING IN FORCE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Police Care UK
Nova Scotia House
70 Goldsworth Road
WOKING
GU21 6LQ
- Phone:
- 0300 012 0030
- Email:
- hello@policecare.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window