SARUM BOOKS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running bookshop in Salisbury know as Sarum Books
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 02 April 2013: Standard registration
- 26 July 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.96k | £99.87k | £64.95k | £44.50k | £35.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.49k | £98.87k | £67.49k | £48.41k | £35.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 28 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 28 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 18 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 05 June 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 25 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 09 May 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 JAN 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (,THE OBJECTS') ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF SELLING, PROMOTING AND DISTRIBUTING CHRISTIAN LITERATURE IN PRINTED AND OTHER FORMS. [NOTHING IN THIS DEED SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.]
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window