Financial history COMMUNITY LEARNING PARTNERSHIP LTD.

Charity number: 1155750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £245.36k £154.08k £230.88k £277.13k £210.00k
Total expenditure £239.09k £202.31k £205.55k £237.61k £236.53k
Income from government contracts £200.75k £120.13k £158.24k £204.22k £173.79k
Income from government grants N/A £8.21k £7.21k £579 £4.40k