Financial history WEST FUND

Charity Number: 1152219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £41.14k £30 £12.60k £6.10k £10.56k
Total expenditure £2.61k £16.32k £6.37k £12.61k £6.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A