Accounts and annual returns SUMMER FUN 4 ALL

Charity Number: 1152079
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 August 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required