Financial history SUMMER FUN 4 ALL

Charity Number: 1152079
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £10.92k £9.54k £14.52k £10.21k £3.71k
Total expenditure £10.96k £9.70k £14.12k £10.09k £3.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A