WAKEFIELD THEATRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Theatre owners & managers; cultural development agency focused primarily on the performing arts in Wakefield District but with extensive national touring throughout the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,006,079
Donations and legacies | £151.59k | |
Charitable activities | £1.42m | |
Other trading activities | £424.23k | |
Investments | £10.53k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,206,318
Raising funds | £202.99k | |
Charitable activities | £2.00m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £151,589 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £202.99k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.00m |
People

22 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 18 September 1974: Standard registration
- WAKEFIELD METROPOLITAN FESTIVAL COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Ackroyd | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL EDWARD WAINWRIGHT | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Freeth | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Abigail Ellen Cattley | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Councillor Michael Graham | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Darren Johnson | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Daniel John McCormack | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Brandon Paul Robinson-Connolly | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Nigel Gordon Brook | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|||||||
Peter Box | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|||||||
KATHRYN MORGAN | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|||||||
Jacquie Speight | Trustee | 12 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.14m | £1.19m | £1.75m | £2.06m | £2.01m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.09m | £823.67k | £1.74m | £2.25m | £2.21m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £70.00k | £585.02k | £271.19k | £225.18k | £151.59k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £186.12k | £976.09k | £315.98k | £213.30k | £151.59k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £376.60k | £213.86k | £292.75k | £408.65k | £424.23k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.58m | £0 | £1.14m | £1.43m | £1.42m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £488 | £203 | £83 | £3.73k | £10.53k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.89m | £727.07k | £1.57m | £2.02m | £2.00m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £205.64k | £96.61k | £168.44k | £235.42k | £202.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.40k | £5.33k | £6.22k | £10.38k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.91m | £1.93m | £1.88m | £1.86m | £1.83m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £607.29k | £835.07k | £1.05m | £1.11m | £1.14m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £719.21k | £595.26k | £691.76k | £832.52k | £864.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JUNE 1974 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 3 JANUARY 2001 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOSTER IMPROVE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS OF MUSIC SINGING DRAMA MIME AND DANCE AND THE ARTS CO-RELATED THEREWITH. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Theatre Royal Wakefield
12 Drury Lane
WAKEFIELD
WF1 2TE
- Phone:
- 01924334112
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window