THE DORSET CANCER CARE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Foundation raises income from running fundraising activities such as charity balls, auctions, raffles, sponsored walks, donations and other events. The net profits are totally distributed in financial grants to deserving cancer sufferers and their families in the County of Dorset. Additionally we support other Dorset based organisations involved in the treatment and care of cancer patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Dorset
Governance
- 11 April 2013: Standard registration
- 12 March 2024: Funds received from 1121829 RICHIE KEEFE LIFE AND SOUL TRUST
- NONE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRISTOPHER JOHN THOMAS | Chair | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Diane Bird | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Barbary | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victor Meirion Szewczyk | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Meryl Julie Ponsford | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE-MAY HARRISON RGN, BSC | Trustee | 14 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
EVELINA MARY WENT RGN OND | Trustee | 14 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.55k | £109.25k | £39.58k | £164.28k | £173.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.66k | £112.84k | £54.82k | £86.45k | £162.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 DEC 2012
Charitable objects
1 THE PROVISION OF A COMPREHENSIVE SUPPORT AND CARE ACTIVITY FOR INDIVIDUAL DORSET BASED CANCER SUFFERERS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDENTS.IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL GRANTS,COUNSELLING SERVICES,SUPPLY OF ITEMS SUCH AS WIGS,SLEEVES PROSTHETICS ETC AND OTHER SUPPORT TO AID THEIR RECOVERY.2TO SUPPORT AND WORK WITH OTHER DORSET BASED CANCER GROUPS, ORGANISATIONS AND HOSPITALS BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ASSIST IN RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN CANCER CURE AND MEDCAL EQUIPMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER PATIENTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Discovery Court Business Centre
551-553 Wallisdown Road
POOLE
BH12 5AG
- Phone:
- 07593890879
- Email:
- hello@dccf.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window