Financial history THE JOHN HARTSON FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1151319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £146.85k £27.98k £82.00k £150.39k £188.66k
Total expenditure £141.15k £19.53k £85.50k £152.72k £169.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A