Trustees COUNCIL FOR CADET RIFLE SHOOTING
Charity number: 1151650

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brigadier Matthew Lowe MBE | Chair | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Mark Patrick Christie OBE | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Rivett-Carnac | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Commander Neil Benstead RN | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Golaszewski | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Craig Stewart | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Toby Mills | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL J S WILSON | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
W G DOE ESQ | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR GENERAL I C DALE | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
WING COMMANDER G CAMPBELL | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR J R W POSTLE | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.