Financial history THE VOICE THAT MAKES A DIFFERENCE

Charity number: 1151890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £49.94k £50.57k £32.94k £31.04k £6.55k
Total expenditure £34.82k £30.66k £74.99k £28.43k £13.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A