Financial history FACT Community Transport

Charity Number: 1151445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £308.60k £2.28m £552.42k £535.76k £685.41k
Total expenditure £201.47k £1.22m £679.05k £674.82k £764.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £64.76k £242.34k £22.32k £121.52k £206.75k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £120.53k £5.92k £6.61k £4.69k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £597.33k £459.69k £529.15k £657.72k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £757 £3 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £1.56m £86.80k £0 £23.00k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.22m £679.05k £674.82k £764.60k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £45.80k £18.66k £19.18k £20.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0