Financial history HAVANT U3A

Charity number: 1151725
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £12.67k £11.58k £13.23k £13.34k £7.94k
Total expenditure £11.80k £12.69k £13.35k £14.22k £6.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A