SOUTH KERRIER HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage, maintain and develop The Museum of Cornish Life, Helston for the benefit of the public and to advance education in the heritage, arts and crafts of the South Kerrier area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £49,500 from 4 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 29 April 2013: CIO registration
- SKHT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Rose Lee | Chair | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Margaret Husk | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Neil Caddy | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Treve Nicholas Evans | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Reynolds | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Chambers | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Pringle | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Johns | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Ruth Wiltshire | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.96k | £270.32k | £228.10k | £234.44k | £269.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.53k | £253.00k | £213.22k | £231.90k | £249.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £45.00k | £82.39k | £75.00k | £47.00k | £49.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Apr 2013 as amended on 11 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO MANAGE, MAINTAIN AND DEVELOP HELSTON MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE HERITAGE, ARTS AND CRAFTS OF THE SOUTH KERRIER AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MUSEUM OF CORNISH LIFE
HELSTON
MARKET PLACE
HELSTON
CORNWALL
- Phone:
- 01326564027
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window