Financial history FRIENDS OF ROTHERFIELD PSA

Charity Number: 1151767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.92k £1.27k £4.00k £0 £500
Total expenditure £2.62k £1.14k £4.14k £4.43k £700
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A