Accounts and annual returns MORTAL FOOLS

Charity Number: 1153400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 14 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 14 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window