Financial history MORTAL FOOLS

Charity Number: 1153400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £289.94k £485.89k £620.61k £434.65k £592.79k
Total expenditure £218.08k £405.15k £382.44k £492.39k £610.79k
Income from government contracts £24.00k N/A N/A N/A £36.87k
Income from government grants £6.20k £95.61k £21.63k £29.72k £103.35k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £10.43k N/A £31.64k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £610.10k N/A £555.76k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £85 N/A £5.39k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £382.44k N/A £610.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.91k N/A £4.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0