Trustees MORTAL FOOLS
Charity number: 1153400

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Wise | Chair | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katie Louise Crawley | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Louise Martin | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Jobson | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Leyden | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart John Rutherford-Orrock | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Mark Gate | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maisie Bjork Elizabeth Saunders | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Spencer | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Stanforth | Trustee | 21 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Pattinson | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.