GRAPEVINE ESSEX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GRAPEVINE ESSEX IS COMMITTED TO PROVIDING AN EXCELLENT AND PROFESSIONAL SERVICE TO ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES; COMPRISING AFFORDABLE, CONFIDENCE BUILDING AND EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES THAT TEACH LIFE SKILLS, SUPPORT INDEPENDENT LIVING AND IMPROVE EMPLOYABILITY. WE'RE DEDICATED TO ENSURING MEMBERS HAVE FUN, FORM FRIENDSHIPS & ENHANCE THEIR LIVES IN A SAFE, SUPPORTIVE & FRIENDLY ENVIRONMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 15 March 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jackie Holland | Chair | 14 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Heighes | Trustee | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Wyatt | Trustee | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Leslie Jones | Trustee | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MONIKA KELLY | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER SCHULTZ | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Johns | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary Schultz | Trustee | 14 March 2014 |
|
|||||
JANE BEVERLEY CROSSMAN | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA HELLIER | Trustee | 14 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.89k | £40.72k | £37.36k | £74.02k | £69.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.58k | £29.35k | £39.62k | £80.12k | £67.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £380 | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Mar 2013 as amended on 23 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR ADULTS AGED 18 AND OVER WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Tulip Hall
31 Clacton Road
St Osyth
Clacton on Sea
CO16 8PA
- Phone:
- 07933631016
- Email:
- info@grapevineessex.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window