MILTON KEYNES ANANDA CLUB

Charity number: 1152284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity?s objects are the advancement of the Hindu religion and Hindu culture and heritage for the public benefit in particular but not exclusively through the holding of prayer meetings and organising cultural functions and Hindu religious festivals (including festivals such as Durga Puja, Laxmi Puja and Kali Puja).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £45,745
Total expenditure: £29,428

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Central Bedfordshire
  • Hertfordshire
  • Luton
  • Northamptonshire
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 June 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Subir Chatterjee Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Sarbendu Mandal Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Sreeparna Garewal Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Bishwadip Roy Trustee 15 April 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.13k £13.59k £13.19k £29.43k £45.75k
Total expenditure £29.30k £4.12k £16.84k £24.68k £29.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.60k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
137 Newport Road
Brooklands
MILTON KEYNES
MK10 7EQ
Phone:
07966000278
Email:
No information available