THE MAYOR OF OLDHAM'S APPEAL-CHILDREN'S HOLIDAY HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a holiday home for children who are resident in the Metropolitan Borough of Oldham, who are in necessitous circumstances, have a disability or in need of convalescence
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oldham
Governance
- 14 October 1974: Standard registration
- OLDHAM CHILDRENS HOLIDAY HOME PROJECT (Working name)
- OLDHAM CHILDREN'S HOLIDAY HOME PROJECT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET COOK | Chair | 05 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Angela Taylor | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Ormrod | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jacobs | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
SONIA BARTON | Trustee | 05 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
James Shaw | Trustee | 11 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Shaw | Trustee | 08 September 2009 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE WALKDEN | Trustee | 08 September 2009 |
|
|
||||
JANE HIGGINSON | Trustee | 08 September 2009 |
|
|
||||
OLDHAM METROPOLITAN BOROUGH COUNCIL | Trustee | 01 January 1978 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.13k | £11.69k | £938 | £300 | £22.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.96k | £13.88k | £25.41k | £36.74k | £20.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2024 | 270 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2023 | 242 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 March 2022 | 508 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MAYOR'S APPEAL DATED 19 AUGUST 1974 AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 OCTOBER 1978
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AN 'ALL THE YEAR ROUND' HOLIDAY HOME FOR CHILDREN WHO ARE RESIDENT INTHE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF OLDHAM, WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, WHO ARE HANDICAPPED OR WHO ARE SICK AND IN NEED OF CANVALESCENCE.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF OLDHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Capital and Treasury Team
The Spindles Offices
Manchester St
Oldham
Lancs
OL1 1NL
- Phone:
- 01617701090
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window