FLORAL HALL COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weddings, Funerals, Parties, Activities, Meetings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 13 June 2013: Standard registration
- THE FLORAL HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Damon Robinson robinson MALE | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIA JACKSON | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE JEANETTE HANNON | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|||||
NEIL EDWARDS | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Jayne Dicker | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
BETTY BIRKIN | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.77k | £75.92k | £0 | £155.67k | £132.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.93k | £84.12k | £0 | £162.93k | £161.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 May 2025 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
15 May 2025 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2025 | 470 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
15 May 2025 | 470 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/02/2013
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF TUNSTALL, STOKE-ON-TRENT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Floral Hall
Queens Avenue
Stoke-on-Trent
ST6 6EE
- Phone:
- 01782237815
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window