AID FOR TRADE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Community Development Network is a free global internet facility providing multimedia resources comprising networking opportunities, training and commercial 'know how' to help equip leaders to assist community led development , linked to the global sustainable development goals The Network is a Christian led charity offering free resources to people of any faith or none
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
- Albania
- Bangladesh
- Benin
- Cameroon
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- Guinea-bissau
- Haiti
- India
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Malawi
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Rwanda
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Togo
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 15 August 2013: CIO registration
- AID FOR TRADE (Working name)
- The Community Development Network (Working name)
- The Ukrainian Friends Network (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Vannes | Chair | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Milden Choongo | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ibrahim Sesay | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL CHARLES TYLER | Trustee | 13 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £830 | £3.62k | £4.30k | £8.35k | £6.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.31k | £4.80k | £4.46k | £7.95k | £4.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Aug 2013
Charitable objects
1.THE RELIEF OF POVERTY 2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION 3.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING RESOURCES, EXPERTISE AND SUPPORT TO ORGANISATIONS /GROUPS ENGAGED IN HELPING INDIVIDUALS, FAMILIES AND GROUPS
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 St. Raphael Road
Worthing
BN11 5HL
- Phone:
- 01903242499
- Email:
- office@aidfortrade.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window