Financial history HANGLETON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1151567
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £77.32k £90.78k £74.76k £89.49k £94.41k
Total expenditure £92.89k £63.76k £74.92k £98.02k £105.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.00k £64.91k £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k