THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, EAST GRINSTEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 06 June 2013: Previously excepted registration
- EAST GRINSTEAD ST MARY PCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADAM CHARLES WOGAN | Chair | 02 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Moona Winsor | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Thomas Bland | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Joan Smith | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elena Christina Mary Smith | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Isabel Orton | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan O Neill | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Arron Champagne Breeze | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Morris | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diane Barbara Mead | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEVE POND | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr KAREN ELIZABETH ROSE BSC. PHD | Trustee | 04 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN GARRETT | Trustee | 04 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.95k | £91.86k | £87.05k | £150.31k | £113.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.18k | £86.37k | £121.78k | £111.77k | £122.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 December 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 December 2021 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 April 2021 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 April 2021 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS VICARAGE
WINDMILL LANE
EAST GRINSTEAD
RH19 2DS
- Phone:
- 07359527160
- Email:
- stmaryschurcheg@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window