Accounts and annual returns TRS GALLERY

Charity number: 1152968
Charity reporting is up to date (158 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 05 December 2024 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 05 December 2024 158 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2022 05 December 2024 524 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 05 December 2024 524 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2020 17 August 2021 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 17 August 2021 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2019 25 August 2020 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 November 2020 153 days late Download Open in new window