SHALDON REGATTA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for the sport of rowing and sailing to enable people to learn how to row, scull and sail and to practise these skills. I addition to run an annual 9 day Regatta with 120 separate events on the water and onshore at Shaldon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 10 May 2013: CIO registration
- SRA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Stuart Clarance | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
James William Stoyle | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Sian Savva | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Lyn Williams | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ASTBURY | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK PILE | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev SUSAN ASTBURY | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jones | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.87k | £7.60k | £11.18k | £29.28k | £20.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.68k | £7.69k | £7.11k | £27.21k | £24.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 10 May 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF ROWING AND SAILING TO ENABLE PEOPLE TO LEARN HOW TO ROW, SCULL AND SAIL AND TO PRACTISE THESE SKILLS. 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN SAILING, ROWING AND SEAMANSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Laurel Lane
Shaldon
TEIGNMOUTH
Devon
TQ14 0AL
- Phone:
- 07808292137
- Email:
- amandasbakery@aol.com
- Website:
-
shaldonregatta.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window