ORMIYAD

Charity number: 1151761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity was formed under a constitution dated 15 March 2013, with its objectives being the advancement of the Orthodox Jewish faith by providing financial and other support for Jewish schools, synagogues and other communal organisations and the relief of those in need because of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage by providing financial support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £27,832
Total expenditure: £44,490

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 April 2013: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BILHA WEIDER Chair 15 March 2013
None on record
DANIEL PETERS Trustee 15 March 2013
None on record
JULIAN WEIDER Trustee 15 March 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.80k £13.34k £37.17k £12.81k £27.83k
Total expenditure £60.69k £67.68k £45.74k £43.22k £44.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 Portland Place
London
W1B 1PU
Phone:
02084556668
Website:

No information available