FOOTBALL JOURNEYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Football Journeys (FJ) is a UK charity that brings young people from diverse communities together to share new experiences, find common ground and break down prejudices. FJ uses football and participatory video as tools to facilitate leadership, skills development and integration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £73,347 from 1 government contract(s) and £14,750 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 June 2013: Standard registration
- LONDON FOOTBALL JOURNEYS (LFJ) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Ian Reeves | Chair | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark McCormack | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlene Gravesande | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pablo Blackwood DL | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Amevor | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rafael Alleyne | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Holmes | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.11k | £113.66k | £115.64k | £150.18k | £263.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.03k | £107.90k | £110.24k | £124.43k | £269.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £73.35k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £23.66k | £5.00k | £14.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/06/2013
Charitable objects
1)THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; AND CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY THROUGH USING SPORT ACTIVITIES AND PARTICIPATORY MEDIA; AND 2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE FROM ALL BACKGROUNDS, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OF BEING INVOLVED IN GANG CULTURE, ANTI SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR AND DRUG ABUSE AND HAVE LITTLE OPPORTUNITY FOR POSITIVE SOCIAL ENGAGEMENT THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 WENLOCK ROAD
LONDON
N1 7GU
- Phone:
- 07901332905
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window