SHIEC (SUSTAINABLE HUB OF INNOVATIVE EMPLOYMENT FOR PEOPLE WITH COMPLEX NEEDS)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AS A RESULT OF THEIR DISABILITY,IN PARTICULAR THOSE WITH SEVERE LEARNING DISABILITIES AND COMPLEX NEEDS,TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY,BY INCREASING OR COORDINATING OPPORTUNITIES TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 April 2013: Standard registration
- 25 November 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 25 November 2017: Funds transferred to 1060714 THE CHALLENGING BEHAVIOUR FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.05k | £23.88k | £4.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £33.82k | £7.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | 07 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2015 | 25 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2014 | 22 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/01/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS("OBJECTS")ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AS A RESULT OF THEIR DISABILITY,IN PARTICULAR THOSE WITH SEVERE LEARNING DISABILITIES AND COMPLEX NEEDS,TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY,IN PARTICULAR BY INCREASING OR COORDINATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE WITH SEVERE LEARNING DISABILITIES AND COMPLEX NEEDS TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window