KUSH YOGA AND THERAPY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a calm, safe and comfortable space to offer one-to-one yoga therapy to children with special needs, and group yoga therapy to special needs school groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 18 July 2013: CIO registration
- KUSH (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Houghton | Trustee | 15 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
YASMIN KAY | Trustee | 23 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WOOD | Trustee | 23 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
BOZWELL KAY | Trustee | 23 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSE MACDONALD | Trustee | 23 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
DANILELLE LOUISE OKILL | Trustee | 23 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.96k | £14.02k | £8.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.02k | £13.47k | £8.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Jul 2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH THROUGH YOGA AND YOGA THERAPY, INCLUDING PROVIDING YOGA THERAPAY TO CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS, OR OTHER HEALTH PROBLEMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hele Linhay
Ashburton
Newton Abbot
TQ13 7NW
- Phone:
- 07740870374
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window