FRIENDS OF NEW BYWAYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to support the relief of people with learning or physical disabilities and any other special needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 28 March 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBORAH MARY MARKHAM | Chair | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Helen Osgerby | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Graham Deverill | Trustee | 23 June 2013 |
|
|||||
MERRIL EVANS | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr CAROL GILLIAN EVELINE KIRKPATRICK | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|||||
ROBERT MARTIN MASLINSKI | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £938 | £10.76k | £908 | £2.34k | £2.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150 | £738 | £382 | £102 | £14.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 FEB 2013
Charitable objects
1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE “OBJECTS”) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1.1.1 TO SUPPORT THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES AND ANY OTHER SPECIAL NEEDS INCLUDING WORKING PROVISIONS FOR THE LONG TERM CARE OF BENEFICIARIES AND MAKING PROVISION FOR THE RELIGIOUS BELIEFS OF BENEFICIARIES; 1.1.2 TO EDUCATE AND/OR TRAIN BENEFICIARIES FOR OCCUPATIONS SUITABLE TO THEIR ABILITIES; 1.1.3 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLEVEDGE HOUSE
HOOK ROAD
NORTH WARNBOROUGH
HOOK
RG29 1ER
- Phone:
- 01256702789
- Email:
- Debmrkhm@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window