ASDA TICKLED PINK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO MAKE DONATIONS TOWARDS RESEARCH AND SUPPORT INTO TREATMENT OF ALL TYPES OF CANCER
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Total income:
£2,857,088
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.86m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,043,297
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.04m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.04m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 August 2013: Standard registration
- 28 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £3.52m | £5.14m | £3.25m | £2.86m | |
|
Total expenditure | £43 | £671.84k | £5.01m | £4.72m | £4.04m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £3.52m | £5.14m | £3.25m | £2.86m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £635.90k | £4.92m | £4.72m | £4.04m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £35.94k | £84.48k | £87.82k | £81.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £2.98m | £3.12m | £1.52m | £360.11k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £128.21k | £135.51k | £7.68k | £36.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 28 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 28 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 30 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2016
(These accounts |
30 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 17 May 2017 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2015
(These accounts |
25 September 2017 | 329 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/08/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO PERSONS WITH CANCER BY: (A) PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, CARE, EMOTIONAL SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL HELP FOR SUCH PERSONS AND BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR THE FAMILIES AND CARERS OF SUCH PERSONS: (B) MAKING DONATIONS AND PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO CANCER TREATMENT CENTRES, HOSPITALS AND PALLIATIVE CARE HOSPICES TO SUPPORT PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM ALL TYPES OF CANCER. 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS BY MAKING DONATIONS TOWARDS RESEARCH INTO AND TREATMENT OF ALL TYPES OF CANCER, PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE MADE PUBLIC. 3. TO MAKE DONATIONS OR PROVIDE ASSISTANCE FOR: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES 4. TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window