Financial history SIGNAL SENSORY IMPAIRMENT GLOBALLY NATIONALLY AND LOCALLY

Charity number: 1151615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £419.33k £392.49k £187.23k £213.60k £221.48k
Total expenditure £385.13k £445.77k £224.32k £229.96k £291.30k
Income from government contracts £1.32k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A