SIGNAL SENSORY IMPAIRMENT GLOBALLY NATIONALLY AND LOCALLY

Charity Number: 1151615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity provides services to people with sensory impairments both in the UK and overseas. Currently, our work is in the field of deafness and hearing impairment. Our UK operations centre around Shrewsbury and Shropshire providing help and support to deaf and hard of hearing children and adults. Overseas, services are provided in Uganda, Tanzania, Malawi and Zambia.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £221,477
Total expenditure: £291,300

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire
  • Telford & Wrekin
  • Malawi
  • Tanzania
  • Uganda
  • Zambia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 2013: Standard registration
  • 10 October 2013: Funds received from 1028312 SHROPSHIRE DEAFNESS ASSOCIATION
  • 21 October 2013: Funds received from 1105958 THE WOODFORD FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simone Julie Banks Trustee 02 December 2022
DEAF REACH
Recently registered
ANTHONY STEPHEN EATON Trustee 07 November 2022
DEAF REACH
Recently registered
Susan Ann Tindall Trustee 07 November 2022
DEAF REACH
Recently registered
Anne Margaret Ryan Trustee 07 November 2022
DEAF REACH
Recently registered
RODNEY JEREMY CLARK OBE Trustee 07 November 2022
None on record
Christopher Kubwimana Trustee 07 November 2022
DEAF REACH
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £419.33k £392.49k £187.23k £213.60k £221.48k
Total expenditure £385.13k £445.77k £224.32k £229.96k £291.30k
Income from government contracts £1.32k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 11 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 11 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
31 SUTTON ROAD
SHREWSBURY
SY2 6DL
Phone:
01743358356